Senate | 02/26/2025 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Third Reading Passed (94-37) | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 01/08/2025 | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 10/01/2024 | Pre-filed | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | First Reading Economic Matters |