Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Third Reading Passed (136-1) | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {773826/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 09/06/2024 | Pre-filed | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |