Maryland 2025 2025 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB234 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/14/2025

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0234*  
  
HOUSE BILL 234 
R5   	5lr0746 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF SB 385 
By: Delegate Stein Delegates Stein, Boyce, Healey, and R. Lewis 
Requested: September 6, 2024 
Introduced and read first time: January 8, 2025 
Assigned to: Environment and Transportation 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 5, 2025 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Vehicle Laws – Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual – Penalties 2 
 
FOR the purpose of altering the penalties for causing the serious physical injury or death 3 
of a vulnerable individual as the result of an individual operating a motor vehicle in 4 
violation of certain provisions of law a certain manner; including an individual who 5 
is lawfully operating or riding a golf cart or a unicycle on a highway, shoulder, 6 
crosswalk, or sidewalk as a vulnerable individual; and generally relating to penalties 7 
for causing the serious physical injury or death of a vulnerable individual. 8 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 9 
 Article – Transportation 10 
Section 21–901.3 11 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 12 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 13 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 14 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 15 
 
Article – Transportation 16 
 
21–901.3. 17 
 
 (a) In this section, “vulnerable individual” means: 18 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 234  
 
 
 (1) A pedestrian, including an individual who is lawfully: 1 
 
 (i) Actively working on a highway or a utility facility along a 2 
highway; 3 
 
 (ii) Providing emergency services on a highway; or 4 
 
 (iii) On a sidewalk or footpath; 5 
 
 (2) An individual who is lawfully riding or leading an animal on a highway, 6 
shoulder, crosswalk, or sidewalk; or 7 
 
 (3) An individual who is lawfully operating or riding any of the following 8 
on a highway, shoulder, crosswalk, or sidewalk: 9 
 
 (i) A bicycle OR UNICYCLE; 10 
 
 (ii) A farm tractor or farm equipment; 11 
 
 (iii) A play vehicle; 12 
 
 (iv) A motor scooter; 13 
 
 (v) A motorcycle; 14 
 
 (vi) An animal–drawn vehicle; 15 
 
 (vii) An EPAMD; or 16 
 
 (viii) A wheelchair; OR 17 
 
 (IX) A GOLF CART. 18 
 
 (b) An individual may not cause the serious physical injury or death of a 19 
vulnerable individual as a result of the individual operating a motor vehicle in: 20 
 
 (1) IN A NEGLIGENT MANNER ; AND 21 
 
 (2) IN violation of any provision of this title. 22 
 
 (c) (1) An individual charged with a violation of subsection (b) of this section: 23 
 
 (i) Must appear in court; and 24 
 
 (ii) May not prepay the fine. 25 
   	HOUSE BILL 234 	3 
 
 
 (2) An individual convicted of a violation of subsection (b) of this section is 1 
subject to IMPRISONMENT NOT EXC EEDING 2 MONTHS OR a fine not exceeding $2,000 2 
OR BOTH. 3 
 
 (d) In addition to the penalties provided under subsection (c) of this section, the 4 
court may order an individual convicted of a violation of subsection (b) of this section to: 5 
 
 (1) Participate in a motor vehicle safety course; and 6 
 
 (2) Perform up to 150 hours of community service. 7 
 
 (e) The Administration shall suspend the driver’s license of an individual 8 
convicted of a violation of subsection (b) of this section for at least 7 days but not more than 9 
6 months. 10 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 11 
October 1, 2025.  12 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.