Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Third Reading Passed (105-28) | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {413923/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/20/2025 | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/16/2025 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |