House | 04/02/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Third Reading Passed (115-24) | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 01/31/2025 | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/20/2025 | First Reading Appropriations |