House | 04/07/2025 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Third Reading Passed (108-31) | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2025 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {323920/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/05/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Referred Finance Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Third Reading Passed (103-30) | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {793522/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/20/2025 | First Reading Economic Matters |