House | 04/07/2025 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Third Reading Passed (113-25) | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2025 | Third Reading Passed (35-7) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {583622/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/05/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Third Reading Passed (123-12) | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {413627/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/20/2025 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |