House | 04/22/2025 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149 | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2025 | Third Reading Passed (40-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Hearing 3/25 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/20/2025 | First Reading Judiciary |