House | 04/01/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Third Reading Passed (130-3) | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {603427/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |