Senate | 03/12/2025 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Third Reading Passed (98-40) | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | First Reading Judiciary |