House | 04/02/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | First Reading Ways and Means |