House | 04/22/2025 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113 | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2025 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Third Reading Passed (115-19) | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | First Reading Judiciary |