EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MATTER ADDE D TO EXISTING LAW . [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. Underlining indicates amendments to bill. Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by amendment. *hb0646* HOUSE BILL 646 E5 5lr2772 CF SB 811 By: Delegates Taylor, Addison, Amprey, Conaway, Crutchfield, Holmes, McCaskill, Phillips, Ruff, Toles, Wells, White Holland, Wilkins, Williams, and Woods Introduced and read first time: January 23, 2025 Assigned to: Judiciary Committee Report: Favorable House action: Adopted Read second time: February 22, 2025 CHAPTER ______ AN ACT concerning 1 Task Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and Expanded 2 Reentry Services – Extension of Report Deadline and Task Force 3 FOR the purpose of extending the deadline for the reporting requirement for the Task Force 4 on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and Expanded Reentry Services; 5 extending the termination date for the Task Force; and generally relating to the Task 6 Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and Expanded Reentry 7 Services. 8 BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 9 Chapter 936 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2024 10 Section 1(a) 11 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 12 Chapter 936 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2024 13 Section 1(i) and 2 14 BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 15 Chapter 937 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2024 16 Section 1(a) 17 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 18 Chapter 937 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2024 19 2 HOUSE BILL 646 Section 1(i) and 2 1 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 2 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 3 Chapter 936 of the Acts of 2024 4 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 5 That: 6 (a) There is a Task Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and 7 Expanded Reentry Services. 8 (i) On or before [December 31, 2025] OCTOBER 31, 2026, the Task Force shall, 9 in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, submit a report to the 10 General Assembly of its findings and recommendations. 11 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect June 12 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of [2] 3 years and 1 month and, at the end of 13 June 30, [2026] 2027, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, 14 shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 15 Chapter 937 of the Acts of 2024 16 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 17 That: 18 (a) There is a Task Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and 19 Expanded Reentry Services. 20 (i) On or before [December 31, 2025] OCTOBER 31, 2026, the Task Force shall, 21 in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, submit a report to the 22 General Assembly of its findings and recommendations. 23 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect June 24 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of [2] 3 years and 1 month and, at the end of 25 June 30, [2026] 2027, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, 26 shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 27 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 28 October 1, 2025. 29