Maryland 2025 2025 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB646 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 04/24/2025

                     	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 113 
 
– 1 – 
Chapter 113 
(House Bill 646) 
 
AN ACT concerning 
 
Task Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and Expanded 
Reentry Services – Extension of Report Deadline and Task Force 
 
FOR the purpose of extending the deadline for the reporting requirement for the Task Force 
on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and Expanded Reentry Services; 
extending the termination date for the Task Force; and generally relating to the Task 
Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and Expanded Reentry 
Services. 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments,  
 Chapter 936 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2024  
 Section 1(a)  
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments,  
 Chapter 936 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2024  
 Section 1(i) and 2 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments,  
 Chapter 937 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2024  
 Section 1(a)  
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments,  
 Chapter 937 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2024  
 Section 1(i) and 2 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 
 
Chapter 936 of the Acts of 2024 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 
That: 
 
 (a) There is a Task Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and 
Expanded Reentry Services. 
 
 (i) On or before [December 31, 2025] OCTOBER 31, 2026, the Task Force shall, 
in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, submit a report to the 
General Assembly of its findings and recommendations.  
  Ch. 113 	2025 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 2 – 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect June 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of [2] 3 years and 1 month and, at the end of 
June 30, [2026] 2027, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, 
shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect.  
 
Chapter 937 of the Acts of 2024 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 
That:  
 
 (a) There is a Task Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and 
Expanded Reentry Services. 
 
 (i) On or before [December 31, 2025] OCTOBER 31, 2026, the Task Force shall, 
in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, submit a report to the 
General Assembly of its findings and recommendations.  
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect June 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of [2] 3 years and 1 month and, at the end of 
June 30, [2026] 2027, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, 
shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act s hall take effect 
October 1, 2025. 
 
Approved by the Governor, April 22, 2025.