House | 04/08/2025 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12 | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Floor Amendment {253427/1 (Senator Kramer) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |