House | 04/05/2025 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2025 | Third Reading Passed (128-8) | ||
House | 04/05/2025 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {593220/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Third Reading Passed (137-3) | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {293420/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |