House | 04/05/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Floor Amendment {243825/1 (Delegate Valderrama) Adopted | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | First Reading Economic Matters |