House | 04/07/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Third Reading Passed (43-4) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2025 | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Bailey) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2025 | Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/05/2025 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Hearing 4/02 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Hearing 4/02 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Third Reading Passed (128-10) | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | First Reading Ways and Means |