Senate | 04/02/2025 | Hearing 4/02 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Hearing 4/02 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Third Reading Passed (131-7) | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/08/2025 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2025 | First Reading Appropriations |