House | 04/07/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Third Reading Passed (132-6) | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2025 | First Reading Ways and Means |