Senate | 04/07/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Third Reading Passed (136-2) | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/14/2025 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {453926/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 10/03/2024 | Pre-filed | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | First Reading Finance |