Senate | 03/31/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/28/2025 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {533620/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2025 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |