Senate | 04/07/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Hearing 3/26 at 2:15 p.m. | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {963422/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/30/2025 | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |