Senate | 03/31/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/15/2025 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/14/2025 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | First Reading Finance |