Maryland 2025 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB492 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/23/2025

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *sb0492*  
  
SENATE BILL 492 
J1, J2   	5lr2354 
    	CF 5lr2353 
By: Senator McKay 
Introduced and read first time: January 22, 2025 
Assigned to: Finance 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Maryland Commission to Study the Dental Hygienist Shortage – Establishment 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Maryland Commission to Study the Dental Hygienist 3 
Shortage; and generally relating to the Maryland Commission to Study the Dental 4 
Hygienist Shortage. 5 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 6 
That: 7 
 
 (a) There is a Maryland Commission to Study the Dental Hygienist Shortage. 8 
 
 (b) The purpose of the Commission is to support the State’s efforts to improve the 9 
oral health of Marylanders by ensuring the stability and sustainability of the State’s dental 10 
hygiene workforce.  11 
 
 (c) The Commission consists of the following members:  12 
 
 (1) the Secretary of Health, or the Secretary’s designee;  13 
 
 (2) the Secretary of Higher Education, or the Secretary’s designee; 14 
 
 (3) one representative of the University of Maryland School of Dental 15 
Hygiene, designated by the Dean of the School; 16 
 
 (4) one representative of the Blueprint for Maryland’s Future 17 
Accountability and Implementation Board, designated by the Chair of the Board; 18 
 
 (5) one representative of the Maryland Commission for Women, designated 19 
by the Chair of the Commission; 20 
  2 	SENATE BILL 492  
 
 
 (6) two representatives of the Maryland Association of Community 1 
Colleges, including a representative of a rural community college with a dental hygiene 2 
program, designated by the Executive Director of the Association; 3 
 
 (7) one representative of the Maryland Dental Hygienists’ Association, 4 
designated by the President of the Association;  5 
 
 (8) one representative of the Maryland Dental Action Coalition, designated 6 
by the Chief Executive Officer of the Coalition; 7 
 
 (9) one representative of the Maryland Rural Health Association, 8 
designated by the President of the Association; 9 
 
 (10) one representative of the Maryland State Dental Association, 10 
designated by the President of the Association; 11 
 
 (11) one representative of the Jon C. Burr Foundation, designated by the 12 
President of the Foundation; 13 
 
 (12) one representative of the Job Opportunities Task Force, designated by 14 
the President of the Task Force; and 15 
 
 (13) the following members, appointed by the Secretary of Health: 16 
 
 (i) a representative from a school of public health who has expertise 17 
in workforce development; 18 
 
 (ii) a representative with expertise in education and training for 19 
dental assistants; 20 
 
 (iii) a representative with expertise in education and training for 21 
community health workers; 22 
 
 (iv) a representative with expertise in stackable credentials in 23 
nursing education; 24 
 
 (v) a representative of a federally qualified health center; and 25 
 
 (vi) a representative from an area health education center.  26 
 
 (d) The Commission may consult with indivi duals and organizations with 27 
expertise in oral health who are represented on the Commission. 28 
 
 (e) The Secretary of Health shall designate the chair of the Commission. 29 
 
 (f) The Maryland Department of Health shall provide staff for the Commission. 30 
   	SENATE BILL 492 	3 
 
 
 (g) A member of the Commission: 1 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Commission; but 2 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 3 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 4 
 
 (h) The Commission shall: 5 
 
 (1) assess the dental hygienist shortage in the State and the impact of the 6 
shortage on oral health in rural, suburban, and urban communities; and  7 
 
 (2) study and make recommendations regarding methods to: 8 
 
 (i) improve the recruitment and retention of dental hygienists in 9 
private practice, community health centers, and public health settings at the statewide 10 
level; 11 
 
 (ii) develop region–specific recruitment and retention strategies for 12 
dental hygienists in rural, suburban, and urban areas of the State; 13 
 
 (iii) expand dental hygiene education opportunities at institutions of 14 
higher education; 15 
 
 (iv) increase retention of dental hygiene students through 16 
educational support and wraparound services; and 17 
 
 (v) support dental assistants and community health workers in 18 
accessing dental hygiene educational opportunities.  19 
 
 (i) (1) On or before December 1, 2025, the Commission shall submit an interim 20 
report of its findings and recommendations to the Maryland Department of Health, the 21 
Maryland Higher Education Commission, and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State 22 
Government Article, the General Assembly. 23 
 
 (2) On or before December 1, 2026, the Commission shall submit a final 24 
report on its findings and recommendations to the Maryland Department of Health, the 25 
Maryland Higher Education Commission, and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State 26 
Government Article, the General Assembly. 27 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 28 
1, 2025. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of June 30, 2027, 29 
this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 30 
of no further force and effect. 31