Senate | 04/07/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2025 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/14/2025 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {663222/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 10/29/2024 | Pre-filed | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |