Senate | 04/07/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Third Reading Passed (116-24) | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2025 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {143429/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Hearing 2/19 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |