Senate | 03/10/2025 | Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Beidle) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Motion Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Ready) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | First Reading Finance |