Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Returned Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Third Reading Passed (101-36)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Floor Amendment {163226/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (34-101)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Floor Amendment {803620/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (37-100)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Floor Amendment {313224/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (38-101)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Floor Amendment {723326/1 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (37-99)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Floor Amendment {273426/1 (Delegate Nawrocki) Rejected (34-100)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate A. Jones) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Referred Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
Favorable with Amendments {223222/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
Favorable with Amendments {223222/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|