House | 03/19/2025 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Third Reading Passed (41-2) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {233723/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |