Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Third Reading Passed (134-5)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Favorable with Amendments {683225/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
Floor Amendment {933521/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
Favorable with Amendments {293127/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator McCray) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Favorable with Amendments {293127/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2025
|
Hearing 2/26 at 3:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2025
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Hearing 2/19 at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
First Reading Budget and Taxation
|
|
|