Maryland 2025 2025 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB7 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/04/2025

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0007*  
  
SENATE BILL 7 
R2   	5lr0872 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 1 
By: Senator M. Jackson 
Requested: September 18, 2024 
Introduced and read first time: January 8, 2025 
Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 16, 2025 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Department of Transportation – Human Trafficking Awareness, Training, and 2 
Response 3 
(See Someone, Save Someone Act) 4 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Department of Transportation to develop or 5 
identify and implement a certain training program for certain transportation–sector 6 
employees on the identification and reporting of suspected human trafficking 7 
victims; requiring certain transportation sector employers to certify that certain 8 
employees have completed the training program; requiring certain transportation 9 
sector employers to establish procedures for reporting suspected human trafficking 10 
to certain entities and to implement a certain human trafficking prevention policy; 11 
prohibiting certain employers or employees from being held civilly or criminally 12 
liable for reporting or responding to in good faith a suspected incident of human 13 
trafficking; requiring the Department to require frequent public service 14 
announcements with safety information for trafficking victims at certain locations; 15 
and generally relating to human trafficking awareness, training, and response. 16 
 
BY adding to 17 
 Article – Transportation 18 
Section 2–114 19 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 20 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 21 
  2 	SENATE BILL 7  
 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 1 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 2 
 
Article – Transportation 3 
 
2–114.  4 
 
 (A) IN THIS SECTION, “TRANSIT SERVICE ” AND “TRANSIT STATION ” HAVE 5 
THE MEANINGS STATED IN § 7–101 OF THIS ARTICLE.  6 
 
 (B) THIS SECTION APPLIES ONLY TO: 7 
 
 (1) AN EMPLOYEE WHO IS : 8 
 
 (I) A STATE EMPLOYEE WHO WO RKS AT A TRANSIT STA TION, 9 
AIRPORT, PORT FACILITY, OR HIGHWAY REST STOP ; 10 
 
 (II) A STATE EMPLOYEE WHO PR OVIDES TRANSIT SERVI CE; OR 11 
 
 (III) EMPLOYED UNDER A CONT RACT WITH THE STATE TO 12 
PROVIDE TRANSIT SERV ICE; OR  13 
 
 (2) AN EMPLOYER OF AN EMP LOYEE DESCRIBED IN I TEM (1) OF THIS 14 
SUBSECTION. 15 
 
 (C) (1) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL : 16 
 
 (I) IN CONSULTATION WITH STAKEHOLDERS , DEVELOP OR 17 
IDENTIFY AND IMPLEME NT A TRAINING PROGRA M THAT INCLUDES A CU RRICULUM 18 
ON THE IDENTIFICATIO N AND REPORTING OF S USPECTED HUMAN TRAFF ICKING; 19 
AND 20 
 
 (II) ADMINISTER THE TRAINI NG PROGRAM TO AL L EMPLOYEES 21 
AND CONTRACT EMPLOYE ES OF THE DEPARTMENT .  22 
 
 (2) THE TRAINING PROGRAM SHALL: 23 
 
 (I) INCLUDE A DEFINITION OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING ; AND 24 
 
 (II) OFFER GUIDANCE TO EMPLOYEE S AND CONTRACT 25 
EMPLOYEES ON THE IDE NTIFICATION OF POTEN TIAL VICTIMS OF HUMA N 26 
TRAFFICKING AND PROT OCOLS FOR REPORTING SUSPECTED HUMAN TRAF FICKING.  27 
 
 (D) (1) EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN PARAGRAPH (2) OF THIS SUBSECTION , 28 
ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2026, AND EACH JANUARY 1 THEREAFTER , EACH 29   	SENATE BILL 7 	3 
 
 
EMPLOYER SHALL CERTI FY TO THE DEPARTMENT THAT ALL T HE EMPLOYER ’S 1 
EMPLOYEES HAVE COMPL ETED THE TRAINING PR OGRAM.  2 
 
 (2) AN EMPLOYER SHALL PRO VIDE A NEW EMPLOYEE WITH THE 3 
TRAINING REQUIRED UN DER THIS SECTION WIT HIN 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF 4 
HIRE.  5 
 
 (E) EACH EMPLOYER , IN CONSULTATION WITH THE DEPARTMENT , SHALL:  6 
 
 (1) ESTABLISH A PROCEDURE FOR EMPLOYEES AND CONTRACT 7 
EMPLOYEES TO REPORT SUSPECTED INCIDENTS OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING TO THE 8 
APPROPRIATE LOCAL AG ENCIES, INCLUDING THE DESIGN ATED REGIO NAL 9 
NAVIGATOR; AND 10 
 
 (2) IMPLEMENT A HUMAN TRA FFICKING PREVENTION POLICY FOR 11 
EMPLOYEES AND CONTRACT EMPLOYEES B Y PROVIDING INFORMAT ION ON HOW TO: 12 
 
 (I) RECOGNIZE POTENTIAL V ICTIMS OF HUMAN TRAF FICKING;  13 
 
 (II) RESPOND TO AN INDIVID UAL WHO MAY BE OR IS A VICTIM 14 
OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING ; AND 15 
 
 (III) CONNECT AN INDIVIDUAL WHO MAY BE OR IS A V ICTIM OF 16 
HUMAN TRAFFICKING WI TH AVAILABLE RESOURC ES.  17 
 
 (F) AN EMPLOYER, AN EMPLOYEE , OR A CONTRACT EMPLOYEE MAY NOT BE 18 
HELD CIVILLY OR CRIM INALLY LIABLE FOR RE PORTING OR RESPONDING IN GOO D 19 
FAITH TO A SUSPECTED INCIDENT OF HUMAN TR AFFICKING.  20 
 
 (G) TO THE EXTENT PRACTIC ABLE, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL REQU IRE 21 
FREQUENT PUBLIC SERV ICE ANNOUNCEMENTS WI TH SAFETY INFORMATIO N FOR 22 
HUMAN TRAFFICKING VI CTIMS TO BE MADE , IN BOTH ENGLISH AND SPANISH, AT 23 
TRANSIT STATIONS , AIRPORTS, PORT FACILITIES, AND HIGHWAY REST STO PS. 24 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 25 
October 1, 2025. 26