House | 03/19/2025 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |