Senate | 03/31/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2025 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Floor Amendment {143020/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {853426/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | First Reading Finance |