Maryland 2025 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB94 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 02/18/2025

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0094*  
  
SENATE BILL 94 
J1   	5lr1471 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 553 
By: Senator Ellis 
Requested: October 29, 2024 
Introduced and read first time: January 8, 2025 
Assigned to: Finance 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted with floor amendments 
Read second time: February 7, 2025 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Maternal Health Self–Measured Blood 2 
Pressure Monitoring  3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring, beginning on a certain date, the Maryland Medical 4 
Assistance Program to provide coverage for self–measured blood pressure 5 
monitoring for certain eligible Program recipients; requiring the Program to develop 6 
and implement a certain education campaign; and generally relating to  7 
self–measured blood pressure monitoring under the Maryland Medical Assistance 8 
Program.  9 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 10 
 Article – Health – General 11 
Section 15–101(h), (j), and (l) and 15–103(a)(1) 12 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 13 
 (2023 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 14 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 15 
 Article – Health – General 16 
Section 15–103(a)(2)(xxiii) and (xxiv) 17 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 18 
 (2023 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 19 
 
BY adding to 20 
 Article – Health – General 21  2 	SENATE BILL 94  
 
 
Section 15–103(a)(2)(xxv) and 15–141.6  1 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 2 
 (2023 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 3 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 4 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 5 
 
Article – Health – General 6 
 
15–101. 7 
 
 (h) “Program” means the Maryland Medical Assistance Program. 8 
 
 (j) “Self–measured blood pressure monitoring” means the regular measurement 9 
of blood pressure by the patient outside the clinical setting, either at home or elsewhere, 10 
requiring the use of a home blood pressure measurement device by the patient. 11 
 
 (l) “Validated home blood pressure monitor” means a blood pressure 12 
measurement device that has been validated for accuracy and is listed in the U.S. Blood 13 
Pressure Validated Device Listing. 14 
 
15–103. 15 
 
 (a) (1) The Secretary shall administer the Maryland Medical Assistance 16 
Program. 17 
 
 (2) The Program: 18 
 
 (xxiii) Beginning on July 1, 2025, shall provide, subject to the 19 
limitations of the State budget, and as permitted by federal law, coverage for biomarker 20 
testing in accordance with § 15–859 of the Insurance Article; [and] 21 
 
 (xxiv) Beginning on January 1, 2025, shall provide coverage for 22 
prostheses in accordance with § 15–844 of the Insurance Article; AND 23 
 
 (XXV) BEGINNING ON JANUARY 1, 2026, SHALL PROVIDE , 24 
SUBJECT TO THE LIMIT ATIONS OF THE STATE BUDGET , AND AS PERMITTED BY 25 
FEDERAL LAW , COVERAGE FOR SELF –MEASURE D BLOOD PRESSURE MON ITORING 26 
FOR ELIGIBLE PROGRAM RECIPIENTS IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 15–141.6 OF THIS 27 
SUBTITLE.  28 
 
15–141.6. 29 
 
 (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE FOLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 30 
INDICATED. 31 
   	SENATE BILL 94 	3 
 
 
 (2) “ELIGIBLE PROGRAM, “ELIGIBLE PROGRAM RECIPIENT” MEANS 1 
A PROGRAM RECIPIENT WHO : 2 
 
 (I) (1)  IS PREGNANT; 3 
 
 (II) (2) IS POSTPARTUM ; OR 4 
 
 (III) (3) HAS BEEN DIAGNOSED WI TH: 5 
 
 1. (I)  CHRONIC KIDNEY DISEAS E; 6 
 
 2. (II)  DIABETES; 7 
 
 3. (III) HEART DISEASE; OR 8 
 
 4. (IV) A CARDIOMETABOLIC DISE ASE. 9 
 
 (3) “HEALTH CARE PROVIDER ” MEANS:  10 
 
 (I) A PERSON WHO IS LICENS ED, CERTIFIED, OR OTHERWISE 11 
AUTHORIZED UNDER THE HEALTH OCCUPATIONS ARTICLE TO PROVIDE HE ALTH 12 
CARE IN THE ORDINARY COURSE OF BUSINESS O R PRACTICE OF A PROF ESSION, OR 13 
IN AN APPROVED EDUCA TION OR TRAINING PROGRAM ; OR 14 
 
 (II) A COMMUNITY HEALTH WOR KER CERTIFIED UNDER TITLE 15 
13, SUBTITLE 37 OF THIS ARTICLE.  16 
 
 (B) THE PROGRAM SHALL PROVIDE COVERAGE FOR SELF –MEASURED 17 
BLOOD PRESSURE MONIT ORING FOR ALL ELIGIB LE PROGRAM RECIPIENTS , 18 
INCLUDING:  19 
 
 (1) THE PROVISION OF VALI DATED HOME BLOOD PRE SSURE 20 
MONITORS; AND 21 
 
 (2) REIMBURSEMENT OF HEAL TH CARE PROVIDER AND OTHER STAFF 22 
TIME USED FOR PATIEN T TRAINING, TRANSMISSION OF BLOO D PRESSURE DATA , 23 
INTERPRETATION OF BL OOD PRESSURE READING S AND REPORTING , REMOTE 24 
PATIENT MONITORING , AND THE DELIVERY OF CO–INTERVENTIONS , INCLUDING 25 
EDUCATIONAL MATERIAL S OR CLASSES.  26 
 
 (C) THE PROGRAM SHALL DEVELOP AND IMPLEMENT AN EDU CATION 27 
CAMPAIGN TO INFORM E LIGIBLE PROGRAM RECIPIENTS AN D HEALTH CARE 28 
PROVIDERS ABOUT THE BENEFITS AN D USAGE OF BLOOD PRE SSURE MONITORING 29  4 	SENATE BILL 94  
 
 
TECHNOLOGY AND THE A VAILABILITY OF ASSIS TANCE WITH SETUP AND 1 
TROUBLESHOOTING .  2 
 
 (D) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 1 EACH YEAR, BEGINNING IN 2027, THE 3 
DEPARTMENT SHALL SUBM IT A REPORT TO THE SENATE FINANCE COMMITTEE AND 4 
THE HOUSE HEALTH AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE, IN 5 
ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE, THAT 6 
INCLUDES: 7 
 
 (1) THE TOTAL NUMBER OF E LIGIBLE PROGRAM RECIPIENTS WH O 8 
RECEIVED BLOOD PRESS URE MONITORS UNDER T HIS SECTION DURING T HE 9 
IMMEDIATELY PRECEDING 12–MONTH PERIOD ; 10 
 
 (2) THE OUTCOMES ASSOCIAT ED WITH THE USE OF T HE HOME BLOOD 11 
PRESSURE MONITORS UN DER THIS SECTION ; AND 12 
 
 (3) ANY COST SAVINGS ACHI EVED BY THE PROGRAM DURING THE 13 
IMMEDIATELY PRECEDIN G FISCAL YEAR ASSOCI ATED WITH THE USE OF THE HOME 14 
BLOOD PRESSURE MONIT ORS DISTRIBUTED IN A CCORDANCE WITH THIS SECTION.  15 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 16 
1, 2025.  17 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.