House | 05/09/2023 | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | On motion of Representative STOVER of Boothbay, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Reports READ. | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Sent down for concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 121 Yeas 24 - Nays 10 - Excused 0 - Absent 1 PREVAILED | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Subsequently On motion by Senator NANGLE of Cumberland The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Taken from the table by the President | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Unfinished Business | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | On motion by Senator NANGLE of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Reports READ | ||
Joint | 04/26/2023 | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 04/04/2023 | Voted: Divided Report | ||
Joint | 04/04/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |