Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 496 Yeas 17 - Nays 10 - Excused 8 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Ordered sent down forthwith.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-267), in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-267) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
READ ONCE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-267).
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/31/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/04/2023
|
Voted: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/04/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|