Page 1 - 131LR1149(03) STATE OF MAINE _____ IN THE YEAR OF OUR LORD TWO THOUSAND TWENTY-THREE _____ H.P. 727 - L.D. 1155 An Act to Address Legislative Salaries Be it enacted by the People of the State of Maine as follows: Sec. 1. 3 MRSA §2, first ¶, as amended by PL 2023, c. 2, §2, is further amended to read: Each member of the Senate and House of Representatives, beginning with the first Wednesday of December 2000 and thereafter until the day before the first Wednesday of December 2024, is entitled to $10,815 in the first year and $7,725 in the 2nd year of each biennium, except that if a Legislator who is a recipient of retirement benefits from the federal Social Security Administration files a written request with the Executive Director of the Legislative Council within one week after the biennium commences, the Legislator is entitled to $9,270 in each year of the biennium. Beginning with the first Wednesday of December 2024, each member of the Senate and House of Representatives is entitled to $25,000 in the first year and $20,000 in the 2nd year of each biennium, except that if a Legislator who is a recipient of retirement benefits from the federal Social Security Administration files a written request with the Executive Director of the Legislative Council within one week after the biennium commences, the Legislator is entitled to $22,500 in each year of the biennium. Each member of the Senate and the House of Representatives must receive a cost-of-living adjustment in annual legislative salary, except that the percentage increase may not exceed 5% in any year, and except that the percentage increase may not exceed 3% beginning with the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014. Beginning December 1, 2001, the salary for each legislative session must be adjusted each December 1st by the percentage change in the Consumer Price Index for the most recently concluded fiscal year; except that a member of the Senate or the House of Representatives may not receive a cost-of-living adjustment in annual legislative salary for the Second Regular Session of the 124th Legislature, and except that a member of the Senate or the House of Representatives may not receive a cost-of-living adjustment in annual legislative salary for the Second Regular Session of the 125th Legislature and the First Regular Session and the Second Regular Session of the 126th Legislature, and any percentage change in the Consumer Price Index for the fiscal years ending June 30, 2011, June 30, 2012 and June 30, 2013 may not be applied to the base salary. In addition, each Legislator is entitled to be paid mileage for travel at each legislative session to and from APPROVED JULY 26, 2023 BY GOVERNOR CHAPTER 446 PUBLIC LAW Page 2 - 131LR1149(03) that Legislator's place of abode at a rate of 55¢ per mile or the federal standard mileage rate, whichever is lower, the mileage to be determined by the most reasonable direct route, except that Legislators may be reimbursed for tolls paid for travel on the Maine Turnpike as long as they have a receipt for payment of the tolls, such tolls to be reimbursed when Legislators use the Maine Turnpike in traveling to and from sessions of the Legislature or in performance of duly authorized committee assignments. Each Legislator is entitled to mileage on the first day of the session, and those amounts of salary and expenses at such times as the Legislature may determine during the session, and the balance at the end of the session. Sec. 2. Appropriations and allocations. The following appropriations and allocations are made. LEGISLATURE Legislature 0081 Initiative: Provides funding for the costs of increasing Legislator salaries starting with the 132nd Legislature to $25,000 in the first year of each biennium and to $20,000 in the 2nd year of each biennium. GENERAL FUND 2023-24 2024-25Personal Services $0 $1,660,000 ____________________ GENERAL FUND TOTAL $0 $1,660,000