Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2023
|
ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2023
|
The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-272) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-473) thereto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-272) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-473) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-272) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-473) thereto ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-473) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-272) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-272) was ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-272)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-272) in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-272) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 257 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Taken from the table by the President
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Unfinished Business
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
On motion by Senator STEWART of Aroostook TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence. Roll Call Ordered
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senator RAFFERTY of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-272).
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-272) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/31/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/25/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/25/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|