House
|
05/10/2024
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-377) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-725) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-377) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-725) thereto ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-725) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-377) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-377) was ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-377)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Unfinished Business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 777 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 FAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
suspension of the Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/26/2023
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-377).
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-377) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
ROLL CALL NO. 288 (Yeas 78 - Nays 66 - Absent 6 - Excused 1)
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
On motion of Representative ROEDER of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Sent down for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-377)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-377) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 390 Yeas 22 - Nays 11 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-377) Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 389 Yeas 11 - Nays 22 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 FAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Senator STEWART of Aroostook moved to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE Bill and accompanying papers
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Senator TIPPING of Penobscot moved to Accept The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-377) Report
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/20/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/24/2023
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|