Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-389) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-483) thereto in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-389) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-483) thereto ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
House Amendment "A" (H-483) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-389) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-389) READ
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-389) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-483) thereto.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-389) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-483) thereto was ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
On motion of Representative GRAMLICH of Old Orchard Beach, House Amendment "A" (H-483) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-389) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-389) was READ.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Subsequently, on motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Speaker laid before the House
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Unfinished Business
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Later today assigned.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/07/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/24/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/24/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|