Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-251) in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-251) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended By Committee Amendment "A" (H-251) Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Reports Read
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-251).
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-251) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/26/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/26/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/26/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/19/2023
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On motion by Senator Carney of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
On motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|