Senate | 06/12/2023 | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | ||
Joint | 06/07/2023 | Reported Out: ONTP | ||
Joint | 04/20/2023 | Voted: ONTP | ||
Joint | 04/20/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |