Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-274).
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-274) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Sent down for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-274)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-274) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Taken from the table by the President
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Unfinished Business
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Senator CARNEY of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/12/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/18/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/18/2023
|
Work Session Reconsidered
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/19/2023
|
Voted: ANT. DIV. REP;
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/19/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|