Senate | 02/21/2024 | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Reports Read | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | On motion of Representative PLUECKER of Warren, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Reports READ. | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Joint | 02/14/2024 | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 01/17/2024 | Voted: Divided Report | ||
Joint | 01/17/2024 | Work Session Held | ||
House | 07/26/2023 | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. | ||
Joint | 07/25/2023 | Carry Over Approved | ||
Joint | 06/01/2023 | Carry Over Requested | ||
Joint | 04/26/2023 | Work Session Held: TABLED | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |