Senate | 06/01/2023 | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | On motion by Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Reports Read | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | On motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | Reports READ. | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Joint | 05/24/2023 | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 04/26/2023 | Voted: Divided Report | ||
Joint | 04/26/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |