Senate | 07/26/2023 | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-661). | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | Ordered sent down forthwith. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-661), in concurrence. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | Committee Amendment "A" (H-661) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | READ ONCE. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | ||
Joint | 06/21/2023 | Reported Out: OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 05/11/2023 | Voted: OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 05/11/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |