Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-629) in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-629) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 407 Yeas 26 - Nays 8 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
On motion by Senator TIPPING of Penobscot The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-629).
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-629) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
ROLL CALL NO. 268 (Yeas 79 - Nays 64 - Absent 7 - Excused 1)
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
On motion of Representative ROEDER of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/20/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/24/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/24/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/18/2023
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|