Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 655 Yeas 18 - Nays 12 - Excused 5 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 654 Yeas 11 - Nays 19 - Excused 5 - Absent 0 FAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
On motion by Senator STEWART of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Taken from the table by the President
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 453 (Yeas 73 - Nays 72 - Absent 6 - Excused 0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Speaker laid before the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Unfinished Business
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Later today assigned.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 411 (Yeas 74 - Nays 63 - Absent 14 - Excused 0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 588 Yeas 11 - Nays 24 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 FAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland moved to RECONSIDER
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
RELEASED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
HELD at the Request of Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 585 Yeas 23 - Nays 12 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-792) in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-792) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 584 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
On motion by Same Senator Report B Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-792) ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 583 Yeas 15 - Nays 20 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 FAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Subsequently Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec moved to Accept Report A Ought Not To Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT Report A Ought Not to Pass , In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec moved to ACCEPT Report A Ought Not to Pass .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-792).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-792) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 392 (Yeas 74 - Nays 67 - Absent 9 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
On motion of Representative SUPICA of Bangor, REPORT B Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM/OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/27/2024
|
Work Session Reconsidered
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/27/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/06/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/22/2023
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|