Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2023
|
ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2023
|
The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-128) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-485) thereto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-128) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-485) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-128) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-485) thereto ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-485) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-128) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-128) was ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-128)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-128).
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-128) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-128)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-128) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/03/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/03/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|